open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

COLORADO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01600
    Party Name:Waln v. Phillips County Sheriffs' Office et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cod.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?189572
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =