open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado

COLORADO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:19-01359-
    Party Name:Lor et al v. Davis
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Judgment for AP Case]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Other Order]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Non-Contested Matter]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Compliance With Rules]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [File]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Response to Show Cause Order]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Show Cause]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Failure to Comply with LBR 5005-4]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Receipt of Filing Fee]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cob.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?490192
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =