open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

COLORADO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:1:19-cv-03380
    Party Name:Coleman et al v. Lochert
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:June 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Note Regarding Default]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [RETIRED Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Retired]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Default]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Reset]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reset]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cod.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?193718
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =