U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-rj-00011
  • Case Name: Milliner v. Bock et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Quash]
October, 2024
  • October 20, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 11, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.