U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sullivan, III
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.