U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Piedra-Gutierrez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • April 30, 2025: [Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 30, 2025: [Dismiss Counts]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 28, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • April 22, 2025: [Non-Guideline Sentence]
  • April 18, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • April 15, 2025: [New Trial ]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for James Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 19, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Disclose Grand Jury]
  • March 13, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • March 12, 2025: [Disclose Grand Jury]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.