U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10799-
  • Case Name: Chaim David Benell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [3015 Notice]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [1009-1.1 Notice of Amendment to Voluntary Petition, Lists, Schedules, or Statements]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Declaration Re: Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Schedule J]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Schedule I]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Schedule H]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Statement of Financial Affairs]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Confirmation Status Report]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Objection to Confirmation/Modification of Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Objection to Confirmation/Modification of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.