U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00302-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perlstein
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for James Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for James Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • April 04, 2025: [James Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 03, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.