U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stanland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Writ Returned]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Writ Issued]
  • March 07, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 07, 2022: [Seal]
  • March 07, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Writ Issued]
  • March 01, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 01, 2022: [Application for Writ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 28, 2022: [Seal]
  • February 28, 2022: [Application for Writ]
June, 2014
  • June 04, 2014: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.