U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fletcher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 15, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 15, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • January 14, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 08, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 05, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 23, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 24, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 17, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2014
  • June 05, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.