U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vasquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • September 02, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • September 02, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 15, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 30, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • July 22, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 22, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • July 21, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • July 21, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 12, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • December 19, 2019: [Seal]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • December 12, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • December 12, 2019: [Seal]
  • December 12, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 06, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • November 25, 2019: [Seal]
  • November 25, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 08, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • November 01, 2019: [Seal]
  • November 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Transcript]
  • April 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 29, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 29, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 28, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 27, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 23, 2017: [Seal]
  • March 23, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 15, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 13, 2017: [Seal]
  • March 13, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 09, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 09, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Continue ]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Continue ]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Continue ]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Continue ]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 05, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • May 05, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 05, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 05, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • May 04, 2016: [Sealed Document]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 29, 2016: [Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 24, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 10, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 31, 2015: [Order]
  • July 29, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 29, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2014
  • June 05, 2014: [Writ Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.