U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00181-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 08, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 04, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 04, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 05, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 05, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • May 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 26, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • September 29, 2017: [Sealed Document]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Reply to Response]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Order]
  • July 15, 2015: [Letter]
  • July 13, 2015: [Transcript]
June, 2014
  • June 05, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.