U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bethea
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Transcript]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • February 28, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 28, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 27, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 27, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 20, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • February 14, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • February 14, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 14, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 14, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2014
  • June 09, 2014: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.