U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 03, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 02, 2017: [Dismiss ]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 03, 2017: [Suppress]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Status Conference]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 08, 2016: [Continue ]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Order]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
June, 2014
  • June 16, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.