U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00216-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chirico
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 01, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 01, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 01, 2018: [Seal]
  • February 01, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 01, 2018: [Violation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Continue ]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 22, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • March 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 30, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 14, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 02, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2014
  • June 24, 2014: [Order on Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.