U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:97-cr-00232-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Streater et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 06, 2019: [Document re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Document re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 16, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 20, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • August 03, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 20, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • July 15, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
June, 2014
  • June 26, 2014: [Order of Transfer-USCA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.