U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 02, 2020: [Dismissal of Counts]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Status Conference]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 05, 2016: [Dismiss ]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order]
June, 2014
  • June 28, 2014: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.