U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stanley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 10, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 12, 2022: [Violation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
  • February 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 05, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • January 05, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • January 05, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2021: [Violation Report]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 05, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • December 04, 2019: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2014
  • July 01, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.