U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Juraska
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 10, 2021: [Violation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 26, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 09, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 07, 2021: [Violation Report]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • May 19, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 19, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 13, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • May 12, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 12, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 12, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • May 08, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2014
  • July 10, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.