U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robertson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 14, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • September 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • September 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 13, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 07, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 07, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 07, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 01, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 19, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 09, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 09, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 08, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 06, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
July, 2014
  • July 14, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.