U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00133-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Harvey et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 08, 2017: [Continue ]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 02, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 02, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 26, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • January 26, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 25, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • January 25, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 25, 2017: [Summons Issued]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Order]
  • January 14, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 14, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 14, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • January 08, 2016: [Hearing ]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 22, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2015: [Bond]
  • October 21, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 21, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2015: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • October 21, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 21, 2015: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 08, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • October 08, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 08, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 08, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
July, 2015
  • July 02, 2015: [Notice]
  • July 02, 2015: [Order]
July, 2014
  • July 14, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.