U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00021-10
  • Case Name: USA v. Hudson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Transcript]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • February 11, 2021: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 11, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 09, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 03, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 09, 2020: [Violation Report]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 16, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 01, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 29, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 15, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
  • March 13, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 06, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 06, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 05, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 25, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 21, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 22, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • October 22, 2018: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Order of Transfer]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 26, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 26, 2018: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • January 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 05, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 05, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 18, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 18, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 18, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 15, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 05, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 08, 2017: [Continue ]
  • November 08, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 08, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 03, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 03, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 03, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 03, 2017: [Arrest ]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order Returning Submission]
  • March 23, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • March 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 21, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 21, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • March 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 16, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order of Transfer]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • December 22, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 12, 2016: [Violation Report]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 13, 2016: [Continue ]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 23, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2016: [Bond]
  • August 23, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 22, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 19, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 18, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 18, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 18, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 18, 2016: [Arrest ]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 06, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 06, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2015
  • March 04, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2014
  • July 18, 2014: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.