U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 06, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • September 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Violation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2022: [PS Violation Report No Action]
  • April 08, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2022: [Violation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • February 09, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • February 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Continue ]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Continue ]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 02, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 02, 2020: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 18, 2020: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2020: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 12, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • August 07, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • August 07, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 03, 2020: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
July, 2014
  • July 18, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.