U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Elliot
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Transcript]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Restitution Order]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • August 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • August 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • August 18, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • August 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 18, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • August 18, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 18, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 18, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 10, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2015
  • June 12, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2014
  • July 18, 2014: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.