U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moreno
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2014
  • July 23, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.