U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00070-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Valle et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • July 29, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • July 20, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 26, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
July, 2014
  • July 25, 2014: [USM Return Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.