U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cannon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 12, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • July 28, 2017: [Travel ]
  • July 28, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2014
  • July 30, 2014: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.