U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hammond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 27, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 21, 2022: [Violation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 24, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Transcript]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • June 09, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 08, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 03, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 02, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 01, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 01, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [Transcript]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
July, 2014
  • July 30, 2014: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.