U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lilly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 08, 2021: [Violation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 07, 2021: [Violation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 04, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 09, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2021
  • February 28, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 11, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Travel ]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 18, 2020: [Travel ]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 20, 2020: [Travel ]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 13, 2020: [Transcript]
  • November 10, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 04, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 04, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2014
  • August 01, 2014: [Memorandum Opinion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.