U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poulin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 19, 2022: [Violation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 01, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 25, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 25, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 24, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 13, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 02, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • February 14, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 05, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • April 25, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order]
  • November 29, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 21, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 20, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • November 19, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • November 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 08, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Arrest ]
  • November 08, 2018: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 06, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 20, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 08, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 28, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 04, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Waiver of Sentencing Time]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 17, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Continue ]
August, 2014
  • August 07, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.