U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hajati et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [2255 Motion Filed]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • January 22, 2021: [Instrument Returned]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
  • January 07, 2021: [Exoneration of Bond]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 29, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Transcript]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Bond]
  • July 15, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 29, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 29, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 26, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 26, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 26, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 25, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 25, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 24, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • June 17, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 17, 2020: [Violation Report]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 04, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Receipt for Instrument]
  • September 17, 2019: [Bond]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • September 13, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 13, 2019: [Bond]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 04, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 03, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 29, 2019: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • August 29, 2019: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 29, 2019: [Bond]
  • August 29, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 29, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 29, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 29, 2019: [Arrest ]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 19, 2015: [Seal]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 16, 2015: [Seal]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 07, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 07, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 07, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • August 07, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 07, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 07, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 15, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 01, 2015: [Status Conference]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 29, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 24, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
December, 2014
  • December 11, 2014: [Order for PSI and Report]
August, 2014
  • August 07, 2014: [Travel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.