U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shepard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 08, 2022: [Violation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 09, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 08, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 04, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 03, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • May 03, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 26, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 26, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 19, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 19, 2016: [Seal]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 10, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 07, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 18, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 18, 2016: [Seal]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Order]
  • December 03, 2015: [Status Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Transcript]
  • November 23, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2015
  • October 01, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Show Cause]
August, 2015
  • August 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 23, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Bond]
  • June 26, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2014
  • August 07, 2014: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.