U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00209-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Petrucci
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 17, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • June 16, 2017: [Passport Returned]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Restitution Order]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 06, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 21, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 20, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 13, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2014
  • August 07, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.