U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00073-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Turner et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • December 07, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 30, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 30, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine - 18:3582]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • March 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 05, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 15, 2019: [Letter]
  • February 06, 2019: [Appearance Pro Se]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 16, 2019: [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Letter]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Seal]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 22, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 18, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2018: [Travel ]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 31, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • September 20, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 17, 2016: [Continue ]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Travel ]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2016: [Letter]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 23, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 22, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 22, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 22, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2015: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 15, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 14, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 14, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • October 09, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 09, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 08, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
August, 2014
  • August 11, 2014: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.