U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Transcript]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • November 04, 2016: [Travel ]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 15, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 14, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • July 14, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 14, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 08, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 02, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2014
  • August 12, 2014: [Travel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.