U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00175-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DiMartino
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 13, 2022: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 29, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • April 29, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 29, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 29, 2020: [Seal]
  • April 29, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 24, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 24, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 17, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Transcript]
  • September 04, 2018: [USCA Order]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 10, 2018: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • July 10, 2018: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • July 10, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • July 10, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • July 05, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 02, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Bond]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Medical Exam ]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 12, 2017: [Extension of Time]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 12, 2017: [Court Exhibits]
  • January 12, 2017: [Witness List]
  • January 12, 2017: [Daubert Hearing]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 22, 2016: [Seal]
  • December 19, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 09, 2016: [Seal]
  • December 09, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 05, 2016: [Medical Exam ]
  • December 05, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 05, 2016: [Seal]
  • December 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Transcript]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 18, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 18, 2016: [Transcript]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 13, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Witness List]
  • April 07, 2016: [Exhibit List]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Jury Verdict]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 28, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • March 25, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order]
  • March 24, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • March 23, 2016: [Letter]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • March 23, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • March 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 23, 2016: [Acquittal]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 22, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • March 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 21, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • March 17, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2016: [Jury Selection]
  • March 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2016: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • March 17, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 11, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 04, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 01, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • March 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 24, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 24, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 24, 2016: [Frye Hearing]
  • February 23, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • February 22, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • February 22, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Disqualify / Recuse Counsel]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order]
  • February 12, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 08, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • January 11, 2016: [Reply to Response]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal ]
  • December 03, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 30, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order]
  • September 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • September 14, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 02, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 02, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • August 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 31, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 28, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 28, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 26, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 24, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 21, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 18, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 13, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 13, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 10, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 07, 2015: [Transcript]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 04, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 02, 2015: [Produce ]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Trial Memo]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order]
  • July 23, 2015: [Disqualify / Recuse Counsel]
  • July 21, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 21, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 20, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 20, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • July 16, 2015: [Discovery]
  • July 08, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 07, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 01, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • June 30, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • June 23, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2014
  • August 19, 2014: [Bail Information Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.