U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Price
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • August 06, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 31, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • July 31, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 12, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • July 12, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 02, 2018: [Restitution Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 27, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 27, 2018: [Seal]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 29, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 27, 2018: [Transcript]
  • March 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 19, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 19, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • March 14, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 14, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 14, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • March 07, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 05, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 21, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 21, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 15, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 15, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 14, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 13, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2017: [Continue ]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 28, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Transcript]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 09, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 08, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 08, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 08, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 08, 2015: [Information - Felony]
  • October 08, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 08, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2014
  • August 25, 2014: [Order for PSI and Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.