U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00183-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Siwek
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • March 11, 2019: [USCA Order]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • November 05, 2018: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 24, 2018: [Letter]
  • May 17, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • May 02, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2018: [Transcript]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Writ Returned]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • March 05, 2018: [Leave to File]
  • March 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Continue ]
  • February 21, 2018: [Hearing ]
  • February 09, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Writ Returned]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 06, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 06, 2017: [Seal]
  • November 06, 2017: [Application for Writ]
  • November 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • July 19, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice]
  • July 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice]
  • July 14, 2016: [Letter]
  • July 01, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 01, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 07, 2016: [Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 20, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Letter]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 23, 2016: [Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Letter]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 19, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 08, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 19, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 19, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order]
September, 2014
  • September 04, 2014: [Waiver of Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.