U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hines
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 02, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 03, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Extension of Time]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 09, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 06, 2015: [Extension of Time]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 25, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • August 27, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 27, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 27, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 11, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • August 04, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2014
  • September 06, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.