U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 17, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • May 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 20, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice]
  • August 25, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 24, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 24, 2021: [Violation Report]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
September, 2014
  • September 09, 2014: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.