U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00025-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Briggs et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Violation Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 06, 2023: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 24, 2015: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
September, 2014
  • September 09, 2014: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.