U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lowenstein
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 08, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 30, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • July 16, 2019: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • July 03, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 03, 2019: [Continue ]
  • July 02, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • July 02, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2014
  • September 16, 2014: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.