U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mullings-Rivera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • July 25, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 13, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 13, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 06, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 06, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 05, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 05, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 28, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 28, 2015: [Sealed Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 23, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 23, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 22, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2014
  • September 18, 2014: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.