U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crespo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 01, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Violation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 23, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 01, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 01, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 01, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 25, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 25, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 24, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 24, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • November 18, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 12, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 12, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 12, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 12, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 12, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • November 11, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 11, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 10, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 21, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 29, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 27, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 17, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • July 17, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 10, 2015: [Summons Issued]
September, 2014
  • September 18, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.