U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00255-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Silver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 09, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 07, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 06, 2022: [Writ Returned]
  • June 06, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 17, 2022: [Writ Returned]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 20, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 20, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 09, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Continue ]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Continue ]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 08, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 08, 2017: [Seal]
  • June 08, 2017: [Continue ]
  • June 05, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 02, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Restitution Order]
September, 2014
  • September 26, 2014: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.