U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00197-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Constant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Passport Returned]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • September 07, 2016: [Return of Passport]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 06, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • August 06, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 06, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 30, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 06, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2014
  • October 07, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.