U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:97-cr-00048-15
  • Case Name: USA v. Bernard et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
October, 2020
  • October 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 17, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 17, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 19, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 19, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 07, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • August 05, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 22, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 22, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 20, 2020: [Seal]
  • July 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 20, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 20, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 07, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 02, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 02, 2020: [Seal]
  • July 02, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 29, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 29, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • June 24, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 23, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 23, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 02, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 02, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 02, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 26, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • April 07, 2020: [Seal]
  • April 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order of Transfer]
  • March 09, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 06, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • March 06, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • January 09, 2020: [USCA Request]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 03, 2019: [2255 Motion Filed]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 15, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 15, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 11, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 02, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order]
  • January 30, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 30, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • January 30, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 28, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 25, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • January 24, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • January 17, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2015
  • October 02, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2015
  • April 02, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
October, 2014
  • October 07, 2014: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.