U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00201-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Transcript - Redacted]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • March 07, 2017: [Transcript]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 18, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • November 07, 2016: [Passport Returned]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 09, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 21, 2015: [Notice]
  • October 20, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 15, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 13, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2014
  • October 09, 2014: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.