U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00204-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sheehan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • July 14, 2021: [Exoneration of Bond]
  • July 14, 2021: [Return of Passport]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 04, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 04, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 02, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Continue ]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • August 06, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 06, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Exhibit]
  • July 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2014
  • October 20, 2014: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.