U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:93-cr-00199-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • January 05, 2021: [Reply to Response]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 23, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Transcript]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 21, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • May 15, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 03, 2019: [Continue ]
  • May 02, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 02, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2019: [Reply to Response]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 18, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • November 02, 2017: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Reconsideration]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 12, 2015: [USCA Request]
October, 2014
  • October 22, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.